VR King Construction, LLC v. Y2 Yoga Cotswold, LLC et al
Appellant: VR King Construction, LLC
Appellee: Y2 Yoga Cotswold, LLC
Trustee: A. Burton Shuford
Case Number: 3:2019cv00472
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal by VR King Construction, LLC. (Lewis, Robert)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal by VR King Construction, LLC. (Lewis, Robert)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 Bankruptcy Appeal Record Certificate of Readiness - designations of parties submitted herewith - documents to be accessed through BK ECF system (Attachments: #1 Statement of Issues on Appeal) (bkCH)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal by A. Burton Shuford. Responses due by 10/24/2019 (Shuford, A.)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum to District Court from Bankruptcy Clerk re: Filing Fee Received (bkCH)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal by Y2 Yoga Cotswold, LLC. Responses due by 10/22/2019 (Henderson, James)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Memorandum to District Court from Bankruptcy Clerk re: Filing Fee Due (bkCH)
September 26, 2019 Filing 2 DELETED DOCUMENT - FILED IN ERROR (brl).
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Case Number 18-31635 filed by VR King Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Motion to Convert, #2 Order Denying Reconsideration) (bkCH)
September 23, 2019 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VR King Construction, LLC v. Y2 Yoga Cotswold, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: VR King Construction, LLC
Represented By: Robert Lewis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Y2 Yoga Cotswold, LLC
Represented By: James H. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: A. Burton Shuford
Represented By: A. Burton Shuford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?