Wells Fargo N.A. v. Frep III - Rozzelle Crossing, LLC
Plaintiff: WellsFargo N.A. and Wells Fargo N.A.
Defendant: Frep III - Rozzelle Crossing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00549
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 NOTICE of Cancellation of Evidentiary Oral Argument Hearing scheduled for 12/16/2019 (tmg)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT Judgment and Order for Injunctive Relief, granting #8 Motion. All pending motions are hereby denied as moot, and the hearing currently set for Monday, December 16, 2019 is cancelled. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 12/12/2019. (tmg)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Amended Joint Motion for Entry of Consent Judgment and Order by Wells Fargo N.A.. Responses due by 12/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hutchinson, Richard)
December 9, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument set for 12/16/2019 09:45 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney. (clc)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING & ORDER granting #6 Motion for Entry of Judgment. TAKE NOTICE that an evidentiary hearing in this matter will take place at 9:45 a.m. on December 16, 2019, in Courtroom 1-1 of the Charles R. Jonas Building, 401 W. Trade Street, Charlotte, North Carolina, 28202. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 12/9/19. (clc)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Entry of Consent Judgment and Order by Wells Fargo N.A.. Responses due by 12/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Consent Judgment and Order)(Hutchinson, Richard) Modified text on 11/25/2019 (ctb).
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo N.A. re #1 Complaint, (Hutchinson, Richard)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Frep III - Rozzelle Crossing, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brl)
October 21, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brl)
October 21, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Appointment of Receiver and Related Injunctive Relief re #1 Complaint, by WellsFargo N.A.. Responses due by 11/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Hutchinson, Richard)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Andrew Hutchinson on behalf of WellsFargo N.A. (Hutchinson, Richard)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frep III - Rozzelle Crossing, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4226996), filed by WellsFargo N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Cover Sheet, #12 Summons)(Hutchinson, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2019: #13 Exhibit K) (ctb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo N.A. v. Frep III - Rozzelle Crossing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WellsFargo N.A.
Represented By: Richard Andrew Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo N.A.
Represented By: Richard Andrew Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frep III - Rozzelle Crossing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?