Avoki v. Saul
Plaintiff: William Paul Avoki
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv00572
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney, served on 12/11/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (ctb)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Pltf's #7 Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Medical Records, and Pltf's #8 Sealed Document Exhibit A Medical Records are SEALED and shall remain sealed until further Order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 12/10/2019. (ejb)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Andrew Saul, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Form)(ctb)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall prepare summonses for all appropriate parties andsubmit the summonses to the Clerk within fourteen (14) days ofthe entry of this Order; Upon receipt of the summonses, the Clerk shall deliver process tothe United States Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 11/19/2019. (ctb)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 Pro Se Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Exhibit A Medical Records re: #1 Complaint by William Pual Avoki; (available to William Paul Avoki, Andrew Saul) (rys) Modified text on 11/15/2019 (rys).
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 Pro Se MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiff Medical Records. by William Paul Avoki. Responses due by 12/2/2019 (rys). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 Pro Se NOTICE of Revocation of Authorization for a Release of Medical Information to Defendant Social Security by William Paul Avoki. (rys)
November 4, 2019 Motion referred to W. Carleton Metcalf: #5 AMENDED MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis. (khm)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY Order of Referral - Social Security. Pursuant to the Standing Order 3:13MC95, 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and Local Civil Rule 72.1 this case is referred to a United States Magistrate Judge to make findings of fact, conclusions of law and to recommend disposition of any dispositive motion filed through submission of a Memorandum and Recommendation to the District Judge. Case referred to Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Entered by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/1/2019. (khm)Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Amended MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Paul Avoki. (rys)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (Sealed - Participants) denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Application within thirty (30) days of entry of this Order.. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/26/2019. (brj)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Se Request to Receive Electronic Notification by William Paul Avoki. (brj)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Paul Avoki. (brj)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by William Paul Avoki. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Summons)(brj)
October 24, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Case Assignment Packet. The document was served conventionally at case filing (brj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avoki v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Paul Avoki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?