Gaddis v. Wrenn
Plaintiff: Richard Alan Gaddis, Jr.
Defendant: Lieutenant M G Wrenn and M G Wrenn
Case Number: 3:2019cv00582
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 12/9/19. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice for lack of prosecution. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 12/7/19. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 Mail ( #2 Notice of Deficiency, #3 Order of Instructions and IFP Form) addressed to Richard Alan Gaddis, Jr. returned as undeliverable. (rys) Modified text on 12/3/2019 (rys).
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS mailed to Plaintiff re #1 Complaint (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(rys)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. The filing fee of $400.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Application or Fee due by 11/21/2019. (rys)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M G Wrenn, filed by Richard Alan Gaddis, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rys)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaddis v. Wrenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Alan Gaddis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant M G Wrenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M G Wrenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?