Bryan v. American Credit Financial, LLC
Plaintiff: Cecile M. Bryan
Defendant: American Credit Financial, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00586
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Max O Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from American Credit Financial (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(brj)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cecile M. Bryan. American Credit Financial, LLC served on 11/5/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Piervincenti, Arthur)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to American Credit Financial, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brl)
November 1, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Credit Financial, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4244038), filed by Cecile M. Bryan. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Piervincenti, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryan v. American Credit Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Credit Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecile M. Bryan
Represented By: Arthur H. Piervincenti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?