SengLED USA, Inc. et al v. TVL International, LLC
Defendant: TVL International, LLC
Petitioner: SengLED USA, Inc. and Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00591
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
2 Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 1/17/2020. (mga)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including January 17, 2020 to reply to TVL International's Memorandum of Law in Support to SengLED's Petition to Vacate and/or Modify Arbitration Award (Document No. #22 ). The court on further review, may determine that no reply is warranted. If this occurs, the Court will inform the parties promptly by further order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/31/19. (mga)
December 31, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to TVL International, LCC's Response to Petition to Vacate by SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd.. (Dedman, James)
December 30, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to TVL International, LCC's Response to Petition to Vacate by TVL International, LLC. Replies due by 1/6/2020 (Rabon, Charles)
December 30, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd.. (Dedman, James)
December 30, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to TVL International, LCC's Response to Petition to Vacate by SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd.. Responses due by 1/13/2020 (Dedman, James). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 30, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 1/21/2020. (brl)
December 27, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO SENGLEDS PETITION TO VACATE AND/OR MODIFY ARBITRATION AWARD by TVL International, LLC re: #1 APPLICATION to Confirm or Vacate Arbitration Award, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rabon, Charles)
December 27, 2019 Filing 21 Response/ ANSWER to Complaint /Application by TVL International, LLC.(Rabon, Charles)
December 23, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by TVL International, LLC. Replies due by 12/30/2019 (Wilder, Raboteau)
December 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Raboteau T. Wilder, Jr on behalf of TVL International, LLC (Wilder, Raboteau)
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd.. (Dedman, James)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd.. Responses due by 12/23/2019 (Dedman, James)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 APPLICATION to Confirm or Vacate Arbitration Award,. Defendant TVL International, LLC shall have up to and including December 27, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Petition to Vacate and/or Modify Arbitration Award. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/15/19. (mga)
November 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Sherry X. Wu on behalf of Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd. (Wu, Sherry)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Sherry X. Wu on behalf of SengLED USA, Inc. (Wu, Sherry)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Farnum on behalf of Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd. (Farnum, David)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Farnum on behalf of SengLED USA, Inc. (Farnum, David)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 APPLICATION to Confirm or Vacate Arbitration Award, by TVL International, LLC. (Rabon, Charles). Motions referred to David Keesler.
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Sherry X. Wu is admitted pro hac vice to represent SengLED USA, Inc. and Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/14/19. (mga)
November 14, 2019 Notice to David M. Farnum: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 11/21/2019. (mga)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David M. Farnum is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Petitioner's SengLED USA, Inc. and Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/14/19. (mga)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sherry X. Wu Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4259654. by SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd.. (Dedman, James). Motions referred to David Keesler.
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David M. Farnum Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4259653. by SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd.. (Dedman, James). Motions referred to David Keesler.
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SengLED USA, Inc. (Dedman, James)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd. (Dedman, James)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Reissued Electronically as to TVL International, LLC c/o National Registered Agents, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (rys) Modified text on 11/12/2019 (brl).
November 6, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Senior Judge Graham Mullen no longer assigned to the case per related cases. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to TVL International, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ctb)
November 4, 2019 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ctb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF by SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd. re: #1 APPLICATION to Confirm or Vacate Arbitration Award, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit / Declaration of David Farnum, #2 Exhibit 1 - Partial Final Award, #3 Exhibit 2 - Final Award, #4 Exhibit 3 - Nondisclosure Agreement, #5 Exhibit 4 - TVL's Statement of Claim, #6 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts of the Transcript of the First Day of Arbitration, #7 Exhibit 6 - Suman Deposition (Excerpts), #8 Exhibit 7 - Cease and Desist Letter, #9 Exhibit 8 - Patent License Agreement, #10 Exhibit 9 - TVL-Feit Patent License Agreement, #11 Exhibit 10 - Barbee Expert Report, #12 Exhibit 11 - Excerpts of the Transcript of the Third Day of Arbitration, #13 Exhibit 12 - AAA Commercial Rules, #14 Exhibit 13 - Emails, #15 Exhibit 14 - Suman Declaration (Redacted), #16 Exhibit 15 - Suman Witness Statement)(Dedman, James)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Vacate Arbitration Award (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4245487), filed by SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - March 25, 2019 Partial Final Award, #2 Exhibit 2 - August 9, 2019 Final Award, #3 Exhibit 3 - December 1, 2014 Non-Disclosure Agreement)(Dedman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SengLED USA, Inc. et al v. TVL International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SengLED USA, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Dedman, IV
Represented By: Sherry X. Wu
Represented By: David M. Farnum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd.
Represented By: James M. Dedman, IV
Represented By: Sherry X. Wu
Represented By: David M. Farnum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TVL International, LLC
Represented By: Charles H. Rabon, Jr.
Represented By: Raboteau T. Wilder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?