Bernini Holdings, LLC v. Conrad et al
Plaintiff: Bernini Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Thomas A Conrad and Ricky L Roberts
Case Number: 3:2019cv00603
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Thomas A Conrad, Ricky L Roberts. Responses due by 1/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Stockton, Colin)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Bernini Holdings, LLC. All Defendants. (Pearce, Bradley)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including January 3, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/4/19. (mga)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Thomas A Conrad, Ricky L Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stockton, Colin). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin R. Stockton on behalf of All Defendants (Stockton, Colin)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Thomas A Conrad, Ricky L Roberts. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons - Roberts)(brl)
November 6, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (mek)
November 6, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(mek)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas A Conrad, Ricky L Roberts ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4250432), filed by Bernini Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 to 3 for Complaint, #2 Cover Sheet)(Pearce, Bradley) Modified text on 11/12/2019 (rth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernini Holdings, LLC v. Conrad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A Conrad
Represented By: Colin R. Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky L Roberts
Represented By: Colin R. Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernini Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Bradley Eli Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?