Dowdle v. USA
Petitioner: James Walter Dowdle
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00614
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Text of Order: Petitioner's motion is GRANTED. Petitioner shall have until February 5, 2020 to file a reply in this matter. So Ordered. Entered by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 1/6/2020. (KP)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Government's Response to Petitioner's Motion to Vacate by James Walter Dowdle. Responses due by 1/17/2020 (Hoffman, Megan)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by USA. (Ray, Amy)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO ANSWER 2255 MOTION as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). Responses due by 12/30/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 11/14/2019. (eef)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) re: Criminal Case No. 3:17cr-134-17 ( USA2255Group added.), filed by James Walter Dowdle.(eef)
November 13, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dowdle v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Amy E. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Walter Dowdle
Represented By: Megan Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?