Bennett v. Compass Group, USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Theodore Bennett
Defendant: Compass Group USA, Inc., Gary Wang, Maureen Hall and Jennifer Hayes
Case Number: 3:2019cv00618
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Notice to Mitchell John Baker, Margaret Larkin Watson: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 11/22/2019. (rth)
November 15, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (rth)
November 15, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
November 15, 2019 Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:19-cv-03324. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
November 15, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Western District of North Carolina. (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER AND STIPULATION OF CONSENT TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel that in accord with the requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), Defendants have identified good cause to transfer the venue of this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina; and that Plaintiff, Theodore Bennett, withdraws any opposition to Defendants' request for that transfer; and that the parties, jointly, consent to the transfer of this matter to the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina. The Clerk is to transfer this case to the Western District of North Carolina forthwith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/15/2019) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 27 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Compass Group, USA, Inc., Maureen Hall, Jennifer Hayes, Gary Wang. (Watson, Margaret) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 26 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Margaret L. Watson dated November 14, 2019 re: In lieu of continued briefing of motion to transfer that attached and filed Proposed Stipulation and Order to Transfer the matter be endorsed. Document filed by Compass Group, USA, Inc., Maureen Hall, Jennifer Hayes, Gary Wang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Stipulation & Order to Transfer Venue)(Watson, Margaret) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: At the Conference held before the Court on November 7, 2019, the Court adopted the following briefing schedule for Defendants' Motion To Transfer Venue: Defendants' motion is due December 13, 2019. Plaintiffs response is due January 10, 2020. Defendants' reply is due January 24, 2020. The Parties are reminded that there is a strict page limit of 25 pages. If oral argument is requested, it may be scheduled by the Court. Please wait to hear from the Court to schedule argument. (Motions due by 12/13/2019. Responses due by 1/10/2020 Replies due by 1/24/2020.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/7/2019) (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
November 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth M. Karas: Pre-Motion Conference held on 11/7/2019. Mitchell Baker appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Margaret Watson appeared on behalf of Defendants. No court reporter served. The Court adopted a briefing schedule. See Order. Defendants shall file their Motion To Transfer Venue no later than December 13, 2019. Plaintiff shall file a response by no later than January 10, 2020. Defendants shall file a reply by no later than January 24, 2020.(BKJ) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. The conference will be held on 11/7/2019, 2:00 pm. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/22/2019) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 23 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re: conference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Mitchell J. Baker dated 10/18/19. Document filed by Theodore Bennett.(Baker, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Conference. The Court will hold a pre-motion conference on 11/12/19, at 3:00. SO ORDERED. Pre-Motion Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/16/2019) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Katie Wendle, Esq. dated October 15, 2019 re: Opposition to Pre-motion Letter. Document filed by Theodore Bennett.(Wendle, Katharine) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #19 LETTER MOTION for Conference Re: Motion for Change of Venue addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Margaret L. Watson dated October 10, 2019. filed by Maureen Hall, Jennifer Hayes, Compass Group, USA, Inc., Gary Wang, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #19 LETTER MOTION for Conference Re: Motion for Change of Venue addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Margaret L. Watson dated October 10, 2019. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff is to respond to this letter by 10/15/19. So Ordered. (Responses due by 10/15/2019) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/10/19) (yv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Conference Re: Motion for Change of Venue addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Margaret L. Watson dated October 10, 2019. Document filed by Compass Group, USA, Inc., Maureen Hall, Jennifer Hayes, Gary Wang.(Watson, Margaret) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Mitchell J. Baker dated 10/09/2019 re: Mediation or Conference. Document filed by Theodore Bennett.(Baker, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #12 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Compass Group, USA, Inc., Maureen Hall, Jennifer Hayes, Gary Wang.(Watson, Margaret) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Compass Group PLC for Compass Group, USA, Inc.. Document filed by Compass Group, USA, Inc..(Watson, Margaret) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Parties in the above captioned action, through their respective counsel, that the time for Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended through and including July 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. Compass Group, USA, Inc. answer due 7/15/2019; Maureen Hall answer due 7/15/2019; Jennifer Hayes answer due 7/15/2019; Gary Wang answer due 7/15/2019. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 7/3/2019) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Margaret L. Watson dated July 3, 2019. Document filed by Compass Group, USA, Inc., Maureen Hall, Jennifer Hayes, Gary Wang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation to extend the deadline in which to respond to Complaint)(Watson, Margaret) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. All Defendants. Document filed by Theodore Bennett. (Baker, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 COMPLAINT against Compass Group, USA, Inc., Maureen Hall, Jennifer Hayes, Gary Wang. Document filed by Theodore Bennett.(Baker, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Baker, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maureen Hall. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jennifer Hayes. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gary Wang. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Compass Group, USA, Inc.. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
April 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
April 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mitchell John Baker. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Maureen Hall. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
April 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mitchell John Baker. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 42:1983; County code Westchester;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:2000e; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
April 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Mitchell John Baker to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF was uploaded incorrectly;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
April 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Mitchell John Baker to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jennifer Hayes, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Theodore Bennett. (Baker, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gary Wang, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Theodore Bennett. (Baker, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Maureen Hall, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Theodore Bennett. (Baker, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Compass Group, USA, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Theodore Bennett. (Baker, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Baker, Mitchell) Modified on 4/16/2019 (jgo). [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against Theodore Bennett. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16693700)Document filed by Theodore Bennett.(Baker, Mitchell) Modified on 4/16/2019 (jgo). [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. Compass Group, USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Larkin Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Wang
Represented By: Margaret Larkin Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Hall
Represented By: Margaret Larkin Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Hayes
Represented By: Margaret Larkin Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Bennett
Represented By: Mitchell John Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?