Heroy et al v. Gaston County Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: Guardian ad Litem J. Alexander Heroy, Patricia D Panza, Thomas Panza, C.S., minor, Patricia D Pansa, Thomas P Pansa and J. Alexander Heroy
Defendant: Nicholas Patterson and Gaston County Board of Education
Case Number: 3:2019cv00661
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by J. Alexander Heroy, Patricia D Pansa, Thomas P Pansa. (DeVore, F.)
January 27, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by J. Alexander Heroy, Patricia D Pansa, Thomas P Pansa. Responses due by 2/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(DeVore, F.). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 21, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial Dismissal of Complaint) by Gaston County Board of Education, Nicholas Patterson. (Clark, Daniel)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: five (5) days. Discovery due by 10/21/2020. Motions due by 11/20/2020. Mediation deadline set for 11/1/2020. Ready Date For Trial set for 4/19/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/16/20. (mga)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/16/20. (mga)
January 14, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Consent Protective Order)(DeVore, F.)
January 14, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial Dismissal of Complaint) by J. Alexander Heroy, Patricia D Pansa, Thomas P Pansa. Replies due by 1/21/2020 (DeVore, F.)
January 10, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal - Joint Partial without Prejudice by J. Alexander Heroy, Patricia D Pansa, Thomas P Pansa (DeVore, F.)
January 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John Alexander Heroy on behalf of J. Alexander Heroy (Heroy, John)
January 3, 2020 Case reassigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(clc)
December 31, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 1/21/2020. (brj)
December 31, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial Dismissal of Complaint) (Local Civil Rule 7.1 W.D.N.C.) by Gaston County Board of Education, Nicholas Patterson. (Clark, Daniel)
December 31, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial Dismissal of Complaint) by Gaston County Board of Education, Nicholas Patterson. Responses due by 1/14/2020 (Clark, Daniel)
December 31, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, (And Motion to Dismiss) by Gaston County Board of Education, Nicholas Patterson.(Clark, Daniel)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants shall have leave to file a Memorandum of Law in Support of their Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint in excess of 4,500 words, but not to exceed 9,000 words. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/27/19. (mga)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Gaston County Board of Education, Nicholas Patterson. (Clark, Daniel)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Gaston County Board of Education, Nicholas Patterson. Responses due by 1/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clark, Daniel). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Plaintiffs First Set Of Interrogatories, Requests For Production And Requests For Admission. Defendants shall have up to and including February 3, 2020 to respond to Plaintiffs First Set Of Interrogatories and Requests For Production, and up to and including February 19, 2020 to respond to the Requests For Admission. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/18/19. (mga)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests by Gaston County Board of Education, Nicholas Patterson. Responses due by 1/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clark, Daniel). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal/Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including December 31, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/10/19. (mga)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, (Complaint) by Gaston County Board of Education, Nicholas Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clark, Daniel). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 5, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(eef)
December 5, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (eef)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gaston County Board of Education (Clark, Daniel)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel William Clark on behalf of All Defendants (Clark, Daniel)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Gaston County Superior Court, case number 19CVS4703. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4285145), filed by Nicholas Patterson, Gaston County Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summonses and Complaint)(Clark, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heroy et al v. Gaston County Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guardian ad Litem J. Alexander Heroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia D Panza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Panza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.S., minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia D Pansa
Represented By: F. William DeVore, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas P Pansa
Represented By: F. William DeVore, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Alexander Heroy
Represented By: John Alexander Heroy
Represented By: F. William DeVore, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Patterson
Represented By: Daniel William Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaston County Board of Education
Represented By: Daniel William Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?