Nix v. Adams Beverages of North Carolina, LLC
Plaintiff: Labrannon Nix
Defendant: Adams Beverages of North Carolina, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00669
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
2 Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Adams Beverages of North Carolina, LLC shall have up to and including February 10, 2020 to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/8/20. (mga)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Adams Beverages of North Carolina, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pinson, Meredith). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Labrannon Nix. Adams Beverages of North Carolina, LLC served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service)(Marcus, Geoffrey) Modified duplicate description of attachment on 12/23/2019 (ctb).
December 10, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Senior Judge Graham Mullen no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(eef)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Adams Beverages of North Carolina, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ctb)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4290685), filed by Labrannon Nix. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Become Party Plaintiff)(Marcus, Geoffrey) Modified document description on 12/9/2019 (ctb).
December 9, 2019 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ctb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nix v. Adams Beverages of North Carolina, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams Beverages of North Carolina, LLC
Represented By: Meredith Anne Pinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Labrannon Nix
Represented By: Philip J. Gibbons, Jr
Represented By: Craig Lorne Leis
Represented By: Geoffrey Alexander Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?