Mitchell v. Accelerated Claims, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jeffredia Mitchell
Defendant: Accelerated Claims, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00710
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Accelerated Claims, Inc..(Simpson, Matthew)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Matthew R. Simpson and JonVieve D. Hill for Accelerated Claims, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/4/2020. (mek)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JonVieve D. Hill Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4371209. by Accelerated Claims, Inc.. (Hulse, Nicholas). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew R. Simpson Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4371180. by Accelerated Claims, Inc.. (Hulse, Nicholas). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
February 4, 2020 Notice to Matthew R. Simpson: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 2/11/2020. (mek)
February 4, 2020 Notice to JonVieve D. Hill: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 2/11/2020. (mek)
January 28, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Nicholas Hulse on behalf of Accelerated Claims, Inc., Attorney Kevin Joseph Dalton terminated. (Hulse, Nicholas)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Accelerated Claims, Inc. answer due 2/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/21/2020. (mek)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Accelerated Claims, Inc. (Dalton, Kevin)
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Accelerated Claims, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dalton, Kevin). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Jeffredia Mitchell. Accelerated Claims, Inc. served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Chestnut, Jason)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Accelerated Claims, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brl)
December 30, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
December 30, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brj)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Accelerated Claims, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4314850), filed by Jeffredia Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Become Party Plaintiff)(Chestnut, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Accelerated Claims, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accelerated Claims, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew R. Simpson
Represented By: Nicholas Hulse
Represented By: JonVieve D. Hill
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffredia Mitchell
Represented By: Jason S. Chestnut
Represented By: Philip J. Gibbons, Jr
Represented By: Craig Lorne Leis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?