Fischer v. Charlotte-Mecklenburg Schools Board of Education
Plaintiff: Angela Fischer
Defendant: Charlotte-Mecklenburg Schools Board of Education
Case Number: 3:2019cv00711
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: Two (2) to Three (3) Days. Discovery due by 8/21/2020. Motions due by 9/21/2020. Mediation deadline set for 7/10/2020. Jury Trial set for 1/4/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Robert J. Conrad Jr.. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 2/7/2020. (brl)
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Marcus, Geoffrey)
January 28, 2020 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 2/18/2020. (brj)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Charlotte-Mecklenburg Schools Board of Education.(Woods, J.)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Melissa Woods on behalf of Charlotte-Mecklenburg Schools Board of Education (Woods, J.)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Angela Fischer. Charlotte-Mecklenburg Schools Board of Education served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Marcus, Geoffrey)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Charlotte-Mecklenburg Schools Board of Education. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ctb)
December 30, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ctb)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charlotte-Mecklenburg Schools Board of Education with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4314870), filed by Angela Fischer.(Marcus, Geoffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fischer v. Charlotte-Mecklenburg Schools Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte-Mecklenburg Schools Board of Education
Represented By: J. Melissa Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Fischer
Represented By: Philip J. Gibbons, Jr
Represented By: Craig Lorne Leis
Represented By: Geoffrey Alexander Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?