The Green Pet Shop Enterprises, LLC v. Comfort Revolution
Plaintiff: The Green Pet Shop Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Comfort Revolution
Case Number: 3:2020cv00018
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Acknowledged receipt of electronically transferred case by District of New Jersey, their civil action no. 3:20-cv-02130. (rth)
February 26, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT on the Determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (clc)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Change Venue. The Parties agree that the appropriate venue for this action is the District of New Jersey, Trenton Division. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/26/20. (clc)
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATED MOTION to Change Venue by The Green Pet Shop Enterprises, LLC (Bradley, Timothy) Modified to change event to a motion on 2/19/2020 (clc).
February 6, 2020 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 2/25/2020. (clc)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand - Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Comfort Revolution.(Powell, Noel)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Comfort Revolution (Powell, Noel)
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Due to Improper Venue by Comfort Revolution re: #5 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - State of Delaware Entity Search, #3 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Tom Bruno)(Powell, Noel)
February 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Due to Improper Venue by Comfort Revolution. Responses due by 2/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Powell, Noel)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Comfort Revolution. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ctb)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Green Pet Shop Enterprises, LLC (Bradley, Timothy)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (brj)
January 10, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brj)
January 9, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Comfort Revolution with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4336024), filed by The Green Pet Shop Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 US Patent 8,720,218, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cease and Desist Letter)(Bradley, Timothy) Modified text on 1/15/2020 (brj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Green Pet Shop Enterprises, LLC v. Comfort Revolution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Revolution
Represented By: Noel Dean Powell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Green Pet Shop Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Charles Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?