Mitchell v. D.H. Griffin Infrastructure, LLC
Plaintiff: Travis Mitchell
Defendant: D.H. Griffin Infrastructure, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00051
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: Four (4) Days. Discovery due by 9/3/2020. Motions due by 10/1/2020. Mediation deadline set for 9/17/2020. Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 03/05/2020. (brl)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Watkins, Elizabeth)
January 31, 2020 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 2/19/2020. (brj)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by D.H. Griffin Infrastructure, LLC (Parsons, Kevin)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by D.H. Griffin Infrastructure, LLC.(Parsons, Kevin)
January 24, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (ctb)
January 24, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ctb)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County Superior, case number 19-cvs-24111. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4357903), filed by D.H. Griffin Infrastructure, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Complaint)(Hinson, Philip) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/27/2020) (ctb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. D.H. Griffin Infrastructure, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.H. Griffin Infrastructure, LLC
Represented By: Kevin V. Parsons
Represented By: Philip Andrew Hinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Mitchell
Represented By: Elizabeth Watkins
Represented By: Elizabeth Vennum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?