Knight v. PHH Mortgage Corporation
Plaintiff: Vanessa Chance Knight
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00155
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 3 days. Discovery due by 10/1/2020. Motions due by 11/1/2020. Mediation deadline set for 11/4/2020. Jury Trial set for 1/4/2021 09:01 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/5/20. (clc) (Main Document 8 replaced on 5/7/2020) (clc).
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Rudd, Jamie)
April 9, 2020 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 4/28/2020. (ams)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Rudd, Jamie)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation shall file an Answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, on or before April 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/17/20. (mga)
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer)(Rudd, Jamie). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHH Mortgage Corporation (Rudd, Jamie)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Elizabeth Rudd on behalf of PHH Mortgage Corporation (Rudd, Jamie)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 20-CVS-2638. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4420830), filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Mecklenburg County Superior Court File, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet)(Rudd, Jamie)
March 11, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
March 11, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight v. PHH Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Chance Knight
Represented By: Fred W. DeVore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Rudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?