Carter v. Prospect Airport Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Garnell Carter
Defendant: Prospect Airport Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00251
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Notice to Maxie Broome, Jr., Jason L. Margolin, Mallorie Ryann Bonti: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 5/4/2020. (rth)
April 27, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Prospect Airport Services, Inc. answer due 5/11/2020. (rth)
April 27, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
April 27, 2020 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:20-cv-00326. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #11 --motion to dismiss for improper venue; granting #11 --motion to transfer; directing the clerk to TRANSFER this action to the Charlotte Division of the Western District of North Carolina and to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/27/2020. (BK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/27/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue, or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue Plaintiff's filed by Garnell Carter. (Broome, Maxie) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/27/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue, or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue by Prospect Airport Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Margolin, Jason) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/27/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 --motion for an extension of time; extending through 4/10/2020 the time within which Prospect Airport Services must respond to #1 --complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/9/2020. (BK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/27/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mallorie Ryann Bonti on behalf of Prospect Airport Services, Inc. (Bonti, Mallorie) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/27/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Prospect Airport Services, Inc.. (Margolin, Jason) Modified event type on 3/9/2020 (CTR). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/27/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason L. Margolin on behalf of Prospect Airport Services, Inc. (Margolin, Jason) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/27/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED/PROOF of service by Garnell Carter (Broome, Maxie) Modified on 2/26/2020 (CTR). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/27/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Garnell Carter. Related case(s): no (Broome, Maxie) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/27/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 --notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/12/2020. (GSO) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/27/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/27/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Prospect Airport Services, Inc. (CRH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/27/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prospect Airport Services, Inc. with Jury Demand Filing fee $400, receipt number TPA-59973 filed by Garnell Carter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CRH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Prospect Airport Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prospect Airport Services, Inc.
Represented By: Mallorie Ryann Bonti
Represented By: Jason L. Margolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garnell Carter
Represented By: Maxie Broome, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?