Pompey v. Fifth Third Bancorp
Plaintiff: Anthony Pompey
Defendant: Fifth Third Bancorp
Case Number: 3:2020cv00271
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Telephone Consumer Protection Act (TCPA)
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Fifth Third Bancorp re #11 MOTION to Stay (Watson, Kristen)
July 7, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Fifth Third Bancorp re #11 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S. Supreme Court's Opinion)(Watson, Kristen)
June 30, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Support re #11 MOTION to Stay by Fifth Third Bancorp. (Watson, Kristen)
June 24, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Stay by Anthony Pompey. Replies due by 7/1/2020 (Hormozdi, Shireen)
June 22, 2020 Filing 16 Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Hormozdi, Shireen)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Michael S. Agruss for Anthony Pompey. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/19/2020. (eef)
June 17, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael S. Agruss Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4536738. by Anthony Pompey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hormozdi, Shireen)
June 11, 2020 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 7/2/2020. (brj)
June 11, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fifth Third Bancorp (Lunsford, Mignon)
June 11, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Stay by Fifth Third Bancorp. (Lunsford, Mignon)
June 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay by Fifth Third Bancorp. Responses due by 6/25/2020 (Lunsford, Mignon)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Fifth Third Bancorp.(Lunsford, Mignon)
June 5, 2020 Notice to Karen S. Hockstad: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 6/12/2020. (eef)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Karen S. Hockstad for Fifth Third Bancorp. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/4/2020. (eef)
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fifth Third Bancorp, filed by Anthony Pompey.(Hormozdi, Shireen)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mignon Arrington Lunsford on behalf of Fifth Third Bancorp (Lunsford, Mignon)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen P. Watson on behalf of Fifth Third Bancorp (Watson, Kristen)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Karen S. Hockstad Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4507158. by Fifth Third Bancorp. (Lunsford, Mignon)
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Pompey. Fifth Third Bancorp served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. (Hormozdi, Shireen)
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Fifth Third Bancorp. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brj)
May 11, 2020 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
May 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Shireen Hormozdi on behalf of Anthony Pompey (Hormozdi, Shireen)
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fifth Third Bancorp ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4489663), filed by Anthony Pompey. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Hormozdi, Shireen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pompey v. Fifth Third Bancorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bancorp
Represented By: Karen S. Hockstad
Represented By: Mignon Arrington Lunsford
Represented By: Kristen P. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Pompey
Represented By: Shireen Hormozdi
Represented By: Michael S. Agruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?