Weathers v. Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jasmine Weathers
Defendant: Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00316
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Max O Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 8/18/2020. (brl)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc..(Shelton, Brandon)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc. answer due 7/27/2020. SO ORDERED. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/25/2020. (KCA)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rice, Akya). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Jasmine Weathers. Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc. served on 6/10/2020, answer due 7/1/2020. (Gessner, L.)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brj)
June 5, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4520071), filed by Jasmine Weathers.(Gessner, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weathers v. Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Weathers
Represented By: L. Michelle Gessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?