Hicks v. TriNet HR III, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mark Hicks
Defendant: TriNet HR III, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00317
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Defendant's #4 Motion to Dismiss Fourth Cause of Action. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/28/2020. (tmg)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss by TriNet HR III, Inc.. (Hulse, Nicholas)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Mark Hicks. Replies due by 7/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of David Middleton, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Eric Montgomery, #3 Exhibit NCDOL Documents)(Montgomery, Eric)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Hulse, Nicholas)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 7/13/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/29/2020. (eef)
June 27, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Mark Hicks. Responses due by 7/13/2020 (Montgomery, Eric)
June 23, 2020 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 7/14/2020. (clc)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by TriNet HR III, Inc.. Responses due by 6/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Hulse, Nicholas)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by TriNet HR III, Inc..(Hulse, Nicholas)
June 5, 2020 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TriNet HR III, Inc. (Hulse, Nicholas)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County, NC Superior Court, case number 20-CVS-6595. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4520259), filed by TriNet HR III, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Cover Sheet)(Hulse, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. TriNet HR III, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TriNet HR III, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Hulse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?