Taylor v. Saul
Plaintiff: Sheila Taylor
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv00332
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Marshal. Andrew M. Saul served on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (tmg)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Andrew M. Saul, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM 285)(ams)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 6/16/2020. (ams)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sheila Taylor. (Piemonte, George)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Sheila Taylor.(Piemonte, George)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Taylor
Represented By: George C. Piemonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?