Snyder v. Keystone Powdered Metal Company
Plaintiff: James Edward Snyder
Defendant: Keystone Powdered Metal Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00345
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1396
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Notice to J. Rutledge Young, III: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 7/21/2020. (brl)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. J. Rutledge Young, III is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff James Edward Snyder. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/14/2020. (brl)
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to J. Rutledge Young, III Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4572543. by James Edward Snyder. (Bell, Stephen). Motions referred to David Keesler.
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by James Edward Snyder (Bell, Stephen)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Bell, Stephen)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Keystone Powdered Metal Company.(Milak, Jennifer)
June 19, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brj)
June 19, 2020 Case Referral to Magistrate Judge David Keesler. (brj)
June 19, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keystone Powdered Metal Company (Milak, Jennifer)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Bryant Milak on behalf of Keystone Powdered Metal Company (Milak, Jennifer)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Gaston County Superior Court, case number 20-CVS-1670. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4539988), filed by Keystone Powdered Metal Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Removal)(Milak, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder v. Keystone Powdered Metal Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Snyder
Represented By: Stephen Jenkins Bell
Represented By: J. Rutledge Young, III
Represented By: Kara S, Grevey
Represented By: Joseph Rutledge Young, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keystone Powdered Metal Company
Represented By: Jennifer Bryant Milak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?