Wallace v. State of North Carolina
Defendant: State of North Carolina
Petitioner: Tejerrick Jamal Wallace and Tejerrick Jamal Wallace-El
Case Number: 3:2020cv00381
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 Pro Se MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tejerrick Jamal Wallace. (tlj)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 Pro Se AFFIDAVIT of Notice by Tejerrick Jamal Wallace (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(brl)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The filing fee of $5.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Application or Fee due by 8/4/2020. (brl)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 Pro Se PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Tejerrick Jamal Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(brl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tejerrick Jamal Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tejerrick Jamal Wallace-El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?