Lopez et al v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Paul Imrie, Della Lopez, Shella Gill and Fred Lopez
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Diana Imrie
Case Number: 3:2020cv00386
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Shella Gill, Paul Imrie, Della Lopez, Fred Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Paul Imrie)(Finegan, Daniel)
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Victoria Angle re #10 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- D. Imrie Claim for Death Benefit, #2 Exhibit B- Email from P. Imrie 05/05/2017)(Worley, Benjamin) (Main Document 11 replaced on 8/14/2020) (mga).
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Replies due by 8/21/2020 (Worley, Benjamin)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Response due by 8/17/2020. In the event that the Court denies Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, Plaintiffs' responses to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is due 14 days after the Court's denial of the Motion to Remand. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/30/2020. (Prichard, Daniel)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Via Consent by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Responses due by 8/11/2020 (Worley, Benjamin)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Shella Gill, Paul Imrie, Della Lopez, Fred Lopez. (Lay, M.)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Shella Gill, Paul Imrie, Della Lopez, Fred Lopez. Responses due by 8/5/2020 (Lay, M.)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Worley, Benjamin)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Worley, Benjamin)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Responses due by 8/5/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Placeholder for Audio Recording that is being sent directly to Judge Mullen's chambers via thumb drive., #2 Exhibit B- Email with Beneficiary Designation)(Worley, Benjamin)
July 16, 2020 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Worley, Benjamin)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin L. Worley on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Worley, Benjamin)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Gaston County Civil Superior Court, case number 20-CVS-1700. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4576393), filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Summons and Complaint from State Court Action, #2 Exhibit B Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Diana Imrie, #3 Exhibit C Notice of Removal in State Court Action, #4 Cover Sheet)(Worley, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez et al v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Imrie
Represented By: M. Aaron Lay
Represented By: Daniel J. Finegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Della Lopez
Represented By: M. Aaron Lay
Represented By: Daniel J. Finegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shella Gill
Represented By: M. Aaron Lay
Represented By: Daniel J. Finegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Lopez
Represented By: M. Aaron Lay
Represented By: Daniel J. Finegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Benjamin L. Worley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Imrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?