Roberts v. Cox Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Roberts, Jr.
Defendant: Thomas McCollum, Tommy McCollum, Infinite Communications, Inc., Quality Technologies, Inc., Cox Communications, Inc. and Donovan Martin
Case Number: 3:2020cv00392
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by John Roberts, Jr. Quality Technologies, Inc. served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Gessner, L.)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #17 , #18 and #22 Motions to Dismiss and/or to file an amended complaint is extended through Tuesday, September 22, 2020. Responses due by 9/22/2020 Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/2/2020. (mek)
September 2, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by John Roberts, Jr. Responses due by 9/16/2020 (Gessner, L.). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER finding as moot #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Relief sought herein was granted in response to Amended Motion. See Documents #25 and 26. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/31/2020. (DLG)
August 31, 2020 Notice to kaitlin.lammers@chamberlainlaw.com: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/8/2020. (mga)
August 31, 2020 Notice to Annette AIdalski: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/8/2020. (mga)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Annette A. Idalski for Cox Communications, Inc.; granting #25 Amended Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kaitlin K. Lamers for Cox Communications. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/31/20. (mga) Modified text on 8/31/2020 (mga).
August 27, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Amend/Correct #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kaitlin K. Lammers Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4613133. by Cox Communications, Inc.. Responses due by 9/10/2020 (Goemann, Ethan). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 25, 2020 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Infinite Communications, Inc. (Hardymon, G.)
August 24, 2020 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Infinite Communications, Inc., Thomas McCollum. (Hardymon, G.)
August 24, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Infinite Communications, Inc., Thomas McCollum. Responses due by 9/8/2020 (Hardymon, G.)
August 24, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Thomas McCollum re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Infinite Communications, Inc., Thomas McCollum (Hardymon, G.)
August 24, 2020 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Mark Lee re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Infinite Communications, Inc., Thomas McCollum (Hardymon, G.)
August 24, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Infinite Communications, Inc., Thomas McCollum. (Hardymon, G.)
August 24, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Infinite Communications, Inc., Thomas McCollum. Responses due by 9/8/2020 (Hardymon, G.)
August 24, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Cox Communications, Inc.. Responses due by 9/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Mark Lee, #3 Declaration of Tommy McCollum) (Smith, Frederick)
August 24, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick T. Smith on behalf of Cox Communications, Inc. (Smith, Frederick)
August 10, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kaitlin K. Lammers Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4613133. by Cox Communications, Inc.. (Goemann, Ethan). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 10, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Annette A. Idalski Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4613125. by Cox Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court Admissions) (Goemann, Ethan). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 10, 2020 Notice to Richard G. Rumrell: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 8/17/2020. (mek)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Richard G. Rumrell for Infinite Communications, Inc.,Richard G. Rumrell for Thomas McCollum. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/10/2020. (mek)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Luke Graham Thomas on behalf of Infinite Communications, Inc., Thomas McCollum (Thomas, Luke)
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Richard G. Rumrell Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4612305. by Infinite Communications, Inc., Thomas McCollum. (Hardymon, G.). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cox Communications, Inc. (Goemann, Ethan)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Cox Communications, Inc. answer due 8/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/7/20. (mga)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Cox Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Goemann, Ethan). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Coretz Goemann on behalf of Cox Communications, Inc. (Goemann, Ethan)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Infinite Communications, Inc. and Thomas McCollum answer due 8/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/5/2020. (brl)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Infinite Communications, Inc., Thomas McCollum. (Hardymon, G.). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Kirkland Hardymon on behalf of Infinite Communications, Inc., Thomas McCollum (Hardymon, G.)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by John Roberts, Jr. Cox Communications, Inc. served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Gessner, L.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons -McCollum, #2 Summons -Infinite, #3 Summons -Cox, #4 Summons -Martin)(js)
July 17, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (js)
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4578077), filed by John Roberts, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - John Roberts, Jr. - Consent to Join)(Gessner, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Cox Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas McCollum
Represented By: Richard G. Rumrell
Represented By: G. Kirkland Hardymon
Represented By: Luke Graham Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy McCollum
Represented By: Richard G. Rumrell
Represented By: G. Kirkland Hardymon
Represented By: Luke Graham Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinite Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Richard G. Rumrell
Represented By: G. Kirkland Hardymon
Represented By: Luke Graham Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Annette A. Idalski
Represented By: Kaitlin Lammers
Represented By: Ethan Coretz Goemann
Represented By: Frederick T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donovan Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Roberts, Jr.
Represented By: L. Michelle Gessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?