Allen v. USA Hoist Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Allen
Defendant: Gilbane, Inc., Carolina Elevator Service, Inc., Gilbane Building Company and USA Hoist Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00411
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery. Defendant USA Hoist Company, Inc. shall provide responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents on or before October 23, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/17/20. (mga)
September 16, 2020 Filing 22 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests by USA Hoist Company, Inc.. Responses due by 9/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Barrineau, Caroline). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying without prejudice #20 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery. Defendant USA Hoist Company, Inc. may file a renewed motion that complies with Local Rule 7.1(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/16/20. (mga)
September 15, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests by USA Hoist Company, Inc.. Responses due by 9/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Barrineau, Caroline). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 13, 2020 Filing 19 Miscellaneous Filing by USA Hoist Company, Inc.. Notice of Filing of Acknowledgement of State Court Clerk of Court of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Acknowledgment of State Court Clerk of Court, #2 Certificate of Service)(Barrineau, Caroline)
August 13, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Gilbane Building Company, Gilbane, Inc..(Brown, David)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: Fourteen (14) Days. Discovery due by 5/24/2021. Motions due by 6/24/2021. Mediation deadline set for 6/7/2021. Jury Trial set for 11/1/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Robert J. Conrad Jr.. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 8/13/2020. (brl)
August 6, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin McNeil Young on behalf of USA Hoist Company, Inc. (Young, Erin)
August 5, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley B. Bartolucci on behalf of USA Hoist Company, Inc. (Bartolucci, Ashley)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mingo, Amanda)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Gilbane Building and Gilbane, Inc. shall have up to and including August 13, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/31/20. (mga)
July 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David Leonard Brown on behalf of Gilbane Building Company, Gilbane, Inc. (Brown, David)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Gilbane Building Company, Gilbane, Inc.. (Malone, John). Motions referred to David Keesler.
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John I. Malone, Jr on behalf of Gilbane Building Company, Gilbane, Inc. (Malone, John)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carolina Elevator Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(York, Gregory)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Carolina Elevator Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(York, Gregory)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Michael Allen. USA Hoist Company, Inc. served on 6/25/2020, answer due 7/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mingo, Amanda)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Michael Allen. Gilbane, Inc. served on 6/25/2020, answer due 7/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mingo, Amanda)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Michael Allen. Carolina Elevator Service, Inc. served on 6/25/2020, answer due 7/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mingo, Amanda)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Michael Allen. Gilbane Building Company served on 6/25/2020, answer due 7/16/2020., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Allen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mingo, Amanda)
July 23, 2020 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 8/13/2020. (brj)
July 23, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USA Hoist Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Barrineau, Caroline)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by USA Hoist Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Barrineau, Caroline)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 20-cvs-8538. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4587742), filed by USA Hoist Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #6 Certificate of Service)(Barrineau, Caroline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. USA Hoist Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbane, Inc.
Represented By: David Leonard Brown
Represented By: John I. Malone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolina Elevator Service, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Charles York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbane Building Company
Represented By: David Leonard Brown
Represented By: John I. Malone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Hoist Company, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Bergen Barrineau
Represented By: Christopher M. Kelly
Represented By: Ashley B. Bartolucci
Represented By: Erin McNeil Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Allen
Represented By: Fred W. DeVore, III
Represented By: Amanda A. Mingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?