Serrano et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Pinnix and Meiling Serrano
Defendant: Warner Lambert Company, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Parke, Davis & Co., Warner Lambert Company, Pharmacia LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Parke, Davis & Company LLC and Warner-Lambert Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00462
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Notice to Sharon D. Mayo: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/21/2020. (brl)
October 14, 2020 Notice to Jeffrey H. Horowitz: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/21/2020. (brl)
October 14, 2020 Notice to Daniel Meyers: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/21/2020. (brl)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 , [16, and #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Daniel Meyers, Jeffrey H. Horowitz,Sharon D. Mayo for Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia LLC, Parke, Davis & Company LLC, and Warner-Lambert Company LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/13/2020. (brl)
October 13, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sharon D. Mayo Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4710229. by Parke, Davis & Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lam, Christopher). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey H. Horowitz Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4710223. by Parke, Davis & Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lam, Christopher). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel Meyers Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4710204. by Parke, Davis & Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lam, Christopher). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Request for Preliminary Hearing. Replies due by 11/3/2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/9/2020. (DLG)
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply For Defendants To File Their Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings by Eddie Pinnix, Meiling Serrano. Responses due by 10/23/2020 (Jones, Gregory). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Request for Preliminary Hearing. Responses due by 10/20/2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/8/2020. (DLG)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Request for Preliminary Hearing by Eddie Pinnix, Meiling Serrano. Responses due by 10/22/2020 (Jones, Gregory). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion to Seal. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/30/2020. (KCA)
September 29, 2020 Filing 12 REDACTION to #11 Sealed Document, Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Judgment on The Pleadings by Parke, Davis & Co., Parke, Davis & Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Pharmacia LLC, Warner Lambert Company, Warner Lambert Company, LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC (Lam, Christopher)
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings re: #10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Request for Preliminary Hearing (available to Parke, Davis & Co., Parke, Davis & Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Pharmacia LLC, Eddie Pinnix, Meiling Serrano, Warner Lambert Company, Warner Lambert Company, LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC) (Lam, Christopher)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Request for Preliminary Hearing by Parke, Davis & Co., Parke, Davis & Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Pharmacia LLC, Warner Lambert Company, Warner Lambert Company, LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC. Responses due by 10/13/2020 (Lam, Christopher)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parke, Davis & Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC (Lam, Christopher)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 Defendants' (Redacted) ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint, by Parke, Davis & Co., Parke, Davis & Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Pharmacia LLC, Warner Lambert Company, Warner Lambert Company, LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted, #2 Exhibit 2 - Redacted, #3 Exhibit 3 - Pinnix Supplemental Fact Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - DeLumeau Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - Judgment on FNC)(Lam, Christopher)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Answer to Complaint and Jury Demand re: #1 Complaint, (available to Parke, Davis & Co., Parke, Davis & Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Pharmacia LLC, Eddie Pinnix, Meiling Serrano, Warner Lambert Company, Warner Lambert Company, LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Serrano Supplemental Fact Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Pinnix Supplemental Fact Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Complaints, #4 Exhibit 4 - DeLumeau Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - Judgment on FNC)(Lam, Christopher)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Seal (File Under Seal) by Parke, Davis & Co., Parke, Davis & Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Pharmacia LLC, Warner Lambert Company, Warner Lambert Company, LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Lam, Christopher)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal (File Under Seal) by Parke, Davis & Co., Parke, Davis & Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Pharmacia LLC, Warner Lambert Company, Warner Lambert Company, LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC. Responses due by 10/13/2020 (Lam, Christopher). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Parke, Davis & Company LLC, Pharmacia LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(eef)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia LLC f/k/a Pharmacia Corporation, Parke, Davis & Company LLC f/k/a Parke, Davis & Company, Warner-Lambert Company LLC f/k/a Warner-Lambert Company, filed by Meiling Serrano, Eddie Pinnix. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Parke Davis & Company, #2 Summons - PHARMACIA LLC, #3 Summons - Warner Lambert Company LLC)(Jones, Gregory)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (js)
August 19, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (js)
August 19, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Parke, Davis & Co., Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Warner Lambert Company, Warner Lambert Company, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4628266), filed by Meiling Serrano, Eddie Pinnix. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Parke Davis & Co., #3 Summons - Pfizer, Inc., #4 Summons - Pharmacia Corporation, #5 Summons - Warner Lamber Company, #6 Summons - Warner Lambert Company, LLC)(Jones, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serrano et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Lambert Company, LLC
Represented By: Christopher C. Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Christopher C. Lam
Represented By: Daniel Meyers
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Christopher C. Lam
Represented By: Daniel Meyers
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parke, Davis & Co.
Represented By: Christopher C. Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Lambert Company
Represented By: Christopher C. Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia LLC
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Christopher C. Lam
Represented By: Daniel Meyers
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner-Lambert Company LLC
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Christopher C. Lam
Represented By: Daniel Meyers
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parke, Davis & Company LLC
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Christopher C. Lam
Represented By: Daniel Meyers
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner-Lambert Company
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Christopher C. Lam
Represented By: Daniel Meyers
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Pinnix
Represented By: Gregory Lawing Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meiling Serrano
Represented By: Gregory Lawing Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?