Miller v. Charlotte-Mecklenburg Schools Board of Education
Plaintiff: Cheri Miller
Defendant: Charlotte-Mecklenburg Schools Board of Education
Case Number: 3:2020cv00493
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristopher Lee Caudle on behalf of Charlotte-Mecklenburg Schools Board of Education (Caudle, Kristopher)
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Zemp Campbell on behalf of Charlotte-Mecklenburg Schools Board of Education (Campbell, Christopher)
October 19, 2020 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 11/9/2020. (brj)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Charlotte-Mecklenburg Schools Board of Education.(Sanchez-Myers, Jill)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Charlotte-Mecklenburg Schools Board of Education shall have up to and including October 20, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/6/20. (mga)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Charlotte-Mecklenburg Schools Board of Education. (Sanchez-Myers, Jill). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Y. Sanchez-Myers on behalf of Charlotte-Mecklenburg Schools Board of Education (Sanchez-Myers, Jill)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Reissued Electronically as to Charlotte-Mecklenburg Schools Board of Education. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (clc)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Charlotte-Mecklenburg Schools Board of Education. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (eef)
September 9, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(eef)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charlotte-Mecklenburg Schools Board of Education ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4660391), filed by Cheri Miller.(Cuddy, Andrew) Modified text on 9/22/2020 (rth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Charlotte-Mecklenburg Schools Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte-Mecklenburg Schools Board of Education
Represented By: Kristopher Lee Caudle
Represented By: Jill Y. Sanchez-Myers
Represented By: Christopher Zemp Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheri Miller
Represented By: Andrew Kiernan Cuddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?