Gause v. Hooks et al
Plaintiff: Walter Timothy Gause
Defendant: Department of Public Saftey, Secretary of North Carolina, Eric Hook, OPS North Carolina, North Carolina Department of Corrections, Eric Hooks, State of NC General Assembly, State of NC Justice Department and NC Prisoner Legal Services
Case Number: 3:2020cv00507
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 13 USCA Case Number 20-7659 for #11 Notice of Appeal USCA Case Manager: Jeffrey S. Neal. (hms)
November 5, 2020 Filing 12 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #11 Notice of Appeal (tlj)
November 5, 2020 Original Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit re: #11 Notice of Appeal. (tlj)
November 4, 2020 Filing 11 Pro Se NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #9 Order Dismissing Case by Walter Timothy Gause. (IFP - PLRA) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlj)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 10/26/2020. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brj)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/26/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brj)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee and Directing Monthly Payments be Made from Prison Account of Walter Timothy Gause. Directing correctional facility to transmit payments. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 10/20/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(hms)
October 20, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlj)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 Pro Se AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants Captioned as Motion to Amend and Construe, filed by Walter Timothy Gause. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlj) Modified text on 10/26/2020 (ejb).
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Walter Timothy Gause. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(khm)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. Signed by Clerk of Court on 9/15/2020 (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms) Modified text on 9/15/2020 (reh).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS signed by the Clerk of Court on 9/11/2020 (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(js)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Walter Timothy Gause (js)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Walter Timothy Gause. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gause v. Hooks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Saftey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPS North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Hooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of NC General Assembly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of NC Justice Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NC Prisoner Legal Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Timothy Gause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?