Balthasar v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Erin Balthasar
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00513
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 11/24/2020. (brj)
November 3, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Unum Life Insurance Company of America.(Dean, James)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Unum Life Insurance Company of America answer due 11/3/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/13/2020. (brl)
October 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Hunter Niland, 27101 on behalf of Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Niland, Ryan)
October 12, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Dean, James). Motions referred to David Keesler.
October 12, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Dean, James)
October 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Dean on behalf of Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Dean, James)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tlj)
September 16, 2020 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unum Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4671600), filed by Erin Balthasar.(Whitlow, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balthasar v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: James A. Dean
Represented By: Ryan Hunter Niland, 27101
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Balthasar
Represented By: Robert A. Whitlow
Represented By: Christian Ross Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?