Fonseca v. American National Red Cross et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Fonseca
Defendant: American Red Cross, Does 1-25 and American National Red Cross
Case Number: 3:2020cv00526
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin Fonseca re #3 Summons Issued (js). American National Red Cross served on 10/8/2020. American Red Cross served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. Modified text on 11/18/2020 (brl).
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by American National Red Cross. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Adams, Joshua). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Bernard Tisdale, III on behalf of American National Red Cross (Tisdale, H.)
October 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua R. Adams on behalf of American National Red Cross (Adams, Joshua)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. American National Red Cross answer due 11/23/2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/22/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(DLG)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Conventionally by US Mail as to American National Red Cross, American Red Cross. (brl)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 DELETED DOCUMENT - FILED IN ERROR - PLAINTIFF PAID FILING FEE AT THE TIME OF FILING (brl).
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kevin Fonseca. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(tlj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fonseca v. American National Red Cross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Red Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Red Cross
Represented By: H. Bernard Tisdale, III
Represented By: Joshua R. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Fonseca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?