Securities and Exchange Commission v. Hill
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Eric M Hill
Intervenor: United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 3:2020cv00536
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene , Unopposed MOTION to Stay by United States Department of Justice. Responses due by 10/23/2020 (Ryan, Daniel). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion to Intervene; granting #4 Motion to Stay. This matter is STAYED pending further order of the Court. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/9/2020. (DLG)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Chun Barry on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (Barry, Jennifer)
September 25, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (js)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Eric M Hill. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (js)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eric M Hill with Jury Demand, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Macko, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Michael S. Macko
Represented By: Jennifer Chun Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric M Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Daniel S. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?