Xpress Group, Inc. v. Cuccinelli
Plaintiff: Xpress Group, Inc.
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Case Number: 3:2020cv00568
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Kenneth T. Cuccinelli answer due 1/19/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/7/2020. (brl)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. (Gatehouse, James). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
November 13, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Xpress Group, Inc.. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Cauley, P.)
October 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, US Attorney and US Attorney General. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(js)
October 15, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Xpress Group, Inc. (Cauley, P.)
October 14, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
October 14, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (js)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4712909), filed by Xpress Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet)(Cauley, P.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xpress Group, Inc. v. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: James B. Gatehouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xpress Group, Inc.
Represented By: P. Mercer Cauley
Represented By: Paul Mercer Cauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?