Penegar v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Carra Jane Penegar and Johnny Ray Penegar, Jr.
Defendant: ISO Claims Partners, Inc., Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Verisk Analytics, Inc. and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00585
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. ISO Claims Partners, Inc. answer due 12/31/2020; Verisk Analytics, Inc. answer due 12/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/9/2020. (mek)
December 8, 2020 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint [Second Consent Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint] by ISO Claims Partners, Inc., Verisk Analytics, Inc.. (Feldman, Stephen). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company answer and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company shall file an Answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, on or before December 31, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/8/20. (mga)
December 8, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion for Extension of Time) (Watson, Lewis). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kim E. Rinehart for ISO Claims Partners and Verisk Analytics, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/7/2020. (mek)
December 7, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kim E. Rinehart Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4792377. by ISO Claims Partners, Inc., Verisk Analytics, Inc.. (Feldman, Stephen). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 7, 2020 Notice to Kim E. Rinehart: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 12/14/2020. (mek)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Matthew J. Lavisky is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendants Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/3/20. (mga)
December 3, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Watson, Lewis)
December 3, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Watson, Lewis)
December 3, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew J. Lavisky Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4787633. by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Watson, Lewis). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 3, 2020 Notice to Matthew J. Lavisky: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 12/10/2020. (mga)
December 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by T. Nicholas Goanos on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Goanos, T.)
December 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lewis Andrew Watson on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Watson, Lewis)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants shall file an Answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before December 15, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/19/20. (mga)
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ISO Claims Partners, Inc. (Feldman, Stephen)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Verisk Analytics, Inc. (Feldman, Stephen)
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint [Extension of Deadline to Respond to Complaint] by ISO Claims Partners, Inc., Verisk Analytics, Inc.. (Feldman, Stephen). Motions referred to David Keesler.
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen D. Feldman on behalf of ISO Claims Partners, Inc., Verisk Analytics, Inc. (Feldman, Stephen)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Vernon Rollins Sumwalt on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sumwalt, Vernon)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tlj)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action) against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4727570), filed by Carra Jane Penegar, Johnny Ray Penegar, Jr..(Hughes, John)
October 23, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penegar v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carra Jane Penegar
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Vernon Rollins Sumwalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Ray Penegar, Jr.
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISO Claims Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Kim Elizabeth Rinehart
Represented By: Stephen D. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J. Lavisky
Represented By: T. Nicholas Goanos
Represented By: Lewis Andrew Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verisk Analytics, Inc.
Represented By: Kim Elizabeth Rinehart
Represented By: Stephen D. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J. Lavisky
Represented By: T. Nicholas Goanos
Represented By: Lewis Andrew Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?