Channeltivity, LLC v. Allbound, Inc.
Plaintiff: Channeltivity, LLC
Defendant: Allbound, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00611
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 1/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/22/2020. (eef)
December 22, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Channeltivity, LLC. Responses due by 1/5/2021 (Redding, David). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 18, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Channeltivity, LLC (Redding, David)
December 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Redding on behalf of Channeltivity, LLC (Redding, David)
December 11, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Allbound, Inc.. (Hirsch, Alexandra)
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Allbound, Inc.. Responses due by 12/28/2020 (Hirsch, Alexandra). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Robert D. Carroll for Allbound, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/10/2020. (brl)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert D. Carroll Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4799182. by Allbound, Inc.. (Hirsch, Alexandra). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 10, 2020 Notice to Robert D. Carroll: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 12/17/2020. (brl)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal. Allbound, Inc. answer due 12/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/10/2020. (mek)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Allbound, Inc.. (MacHarg, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David Keesler.
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allbound, Inc. (MacHarg, Jeffrey)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 20-cvs-13414. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4745867), filed by Allbound, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons/Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Notice to Adverse Parties and State Court))(MacHarg, Jeffrey)
November 4, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Channeltivity, LLC v. Allbound, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Channeltivity, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Raymond Pellington
Represented By: David G. Redding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allbound, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Phillips MacHarg
Represented By: Alexandra J. Hirsch
Represented By: Robert D. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?