M.E. Stores Property, LLC v. Epcon Nantz Road, LLC et al
Plaintiff: M.E. Stores Property, LLC
Defendant: Epcon Nantz Road, LLC, Epcon Communities Carolinas, Inc., Epcon Communities, LLC and W. M. Warr & Sons Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00631
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 Amended Complaint. Epcon Communities Carolinas, Inc. answer due 2/22/2021; Epcon Communities, LLC answer due 2/22/2021; Epcon Nantz Road, LLC answer due 2/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/6/21. (mga)
January 6, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #11 Amended Complaint by Epcon Communities Carolinas, Inc., Epcon Communities, LLC, Epcon Nantz Road, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Allowing Extension of Time) (Bromberger, Ross)
December 30, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to W. M. Warr & Sons Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (mga)
December 23, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by M.E. Stores Property, LLC.(Surane, James) (Main Document 11 replaced on 12/30/2020) (mga).
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint on or before December 29, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/22/2020. (mek)
December 22, 2020 Set Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 12/29/2020. (mek)
December 21, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Epcon Nantz Road, LLC (Bromberger, Ross)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Epcon Communities Carolinas, Inc. (Bromberger, Ross)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Epcon Communities, LLC (Bromberger, Ross)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Amend Complaint by M.E. Stores Property, LLC. Responses due by 1/4/2021 (Surane, James)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: three to four days. Discovery due by 5/21/2021. Motions due by 6/15/2021. Mediation deadline set for 6/1/2021. Jury Trial set for 1/3/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/10/2020. (mek)
December 8, 2020 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David Keesler. District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr no longer assigned to the case pursuant to #3 Joint Stipulation of Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed on 12/7/2020. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan . ALL Parties Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction (Bromberger, Ross)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 Joint Stipulation of CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by all parties. (Bromberger, Ross)
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Epcon Communities Carolinas, Inc., Epcon Communities, LLC, Epcon Nantz Road, LLC.(Bromberger, Ross)
November 13, 2020 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 12/4/2020. (brj)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 20-cvs-14594. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4758394), filed by Epcon Communities Carolinas, Inc., Epcon Nantz Road, LLC, Epcon Communities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Notice of Filing)(Bromberger, Ross)
November 12, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.E. Stores Property, LLC v. Epcon Nantz Road, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epcon Nantz Road, LLC
Represented By: Luke P. Sbarra
Represented By: Ross J. Bromberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epcon Communities Carolinas, Inc.
Represented By: Luke P. Sbarra
Represented By: Ross J. Bromberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epcon Communities, LLC
Represented By: Luke P. Sbarra
Represented By: Ross J. Bromberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. M. Warr & Sons Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.E. Stores Property, LLC
Represented By: James William Surane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?