Poston et al v. Stericycle Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Blanchett and Cedric Poston
Defendant: Shred-it USA LLC and Stericycle Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00655
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Joshua B. Waxman is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendants Shred-it USA LLC and Stericycle Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/19/21. (mga)
January 19, 2021 Notice to Joshua B. Waxman: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 1/26/2021. (mga)
January 15, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joshua B. Waxman Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4852616. by Shred-it USA LLC, Stericycle Inc.. (Walters, Jerry). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Richard W. Black is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/14/21. (mga)
January 14, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Richard W. Black Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4849985. by Shred-it USA LLC, Stericycle Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Richard Black Court Admissions) (Walters, Jerry). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 14, 2021 Notice to Richard W. Black: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 1/21/2021. (mga)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Shred-it USA LLC answer due 1/27/2021; Stericycle Inc. answer due 1/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/23/2020. (mek)
December 23, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shred-it USA LLC (Walters, Jerry)
December 23, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stericycle Inc. (Walters, Jerry)
December 23, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Shred-it USA LLC, Stericycle Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Walters, Jerry). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry Howard Walters, Jr on behalf of Shred-it USA LLC, Stericycle Inc. (Walters, Jerry)
December 9, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Cedric Poston, Kenneth Blanchett. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service of Summons on Defendant Stericycle Inc, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service of Summons on Defendant Shred-it USA LLC)(Hernandez, Gilda)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing of Consents to Join Suit as Opt-in Plaintiffs by Kenneth Blanchett, Cedric Poston (Attachments: #1 Consent to File Suit of Opti-in Plaintiff Phillip Daniel, #2 Consent to File Suit of Opti-in Plaintiff Derrick Hinton, #3 Consent to File Suit of Opti-in Plaintiff Jason Leonce, #4 Consent to File Suit of Opti-in Plaintiff Antonio Morris, #5 Consent to File Suit of Opti-in Plaintiff Treshon Stevens, #6 Consent to File Suit of Opti-in Plaintiff Tobias Williams)(Hernandez, Gilda)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Shred-it USA LLC, Stericycle Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons - Shred-It USA LLC)(brl)
November 25, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tucci, Robert)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlotte Claire Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, Charlotte)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Gilda Adriana Hernandez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hernandez, Gilda)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kenneth Blanchett (Hernandez, Gilda)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cedric Poston (Hernandez, Gilda)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4777055), filed by Cedric Poston, Kenneth Blanchett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NCDOL REDA Right-to-Sue Notices, #2 Exhibit B - Notice and Consents to File Suit as Named Plaintiffs, #3 Cover Sheet)(Hernandez, Gilda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poston et al v. Stericycle Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Blanchett
Represented By: Gilda Adriana Hernandez
Represented By: Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci
Represented By: Charlotte Claire Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Poston
Represented By: Gilda Adriana Hernandez
Represented By: Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci
Represented By: Charlotte Claire Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shred-it USA LLC
Represented By: Jerry Howard Walters, Jr.
Represented By: Richard W. Black
Represented By: Joshua B. Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stericycle Inc.
Represented By: Jerry Howard Walters, Jr.
Represented By: Richard W. Black
Represented By: Joshua B. Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?