United States of America v. Approximately $90,600 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $90,600 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 3:2020cv00656
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date December 31, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, J.)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of SERVICE (DIRECT NOTICE) by United States of America re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, J.)
November 27, 2020 Filing 3 Department of the Treasury Process Receipt and Return re #2 Warrant Issued for Arrest of Property, filed by United States of America. (Johnson, J.)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 WARRANT Issued for Arrest of Property Signed by Clerk Frank G. Johns on 11/25/2020 (brl)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against Approximately $90,600 in U.S. Currency, filed by United States of America.(Johnson, J.)
November 25, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $90,600 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $90,600 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: J. Seth Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?