Isenhour v. Blythe Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: Denise A Isenhour and Denise A. Isenhour
Defendant: Blythe Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00661
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 2/2/2021. (brl)
January 11, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blythe Construction, Inc. (Rice, Akya)
January 11, 2021 Filing 8 Defendant Blythe Construction, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Blythe Construction, Inc..(Rice, Akya)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Blythe Construction, Inc. answer due 1/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/18/2020. (mek)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth R. Gift on behalf of Blythe Construction, Inc. (Gift, Elizabeth)
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Blythe Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rice, Akya). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Denise A. Isenhour. Denise A. Isenhour served on 12/5/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Combs, Todd)
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Reissued Electronically as to Blythe Construction, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (eef)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Blythe Construction, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tlj)
November 25, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blythe Construction with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4778755), filed by Denise A. Isenhour. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #2 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination)(Combs, Todd) Modified text on 11/25/2020 (mga).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isenhour v. Blythe Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blythe Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Gift
Represented By: Akya Shanelle Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise A Isenhour
Represented By: Todd J. Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise A. Isenhour
Represented By: Todd J. Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?