Langston v. Second Harvest Food Bank of Metrolina, Inc.
Plaintiff: Candice Langston
Defendant: Second Harvest Food Bank of Metrolina, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00680
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Yount Ferrell on behalf of Second Harvest Food Bank of Metrolina, Inc. (Ferrell, Jacqueline)
January 22, 2021 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 2/10/2021. (clc)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Second Harvest Food Bank of Metrolina, Inc..(Lay, Wood)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Second Harvest Food Bank of Metrolina, Inc. answer due 1/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/23/2020. (mek)
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Second Harvest Food Bank of Metrolina, Inc. (Lay, Wood)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Second Harvest Food Bank of Metrolina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lay, Wood). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Second Harvest Food Bank of Metrolina, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (eef)
December 8, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(eef)
December 8, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (eef)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Second Harvest Food Bank of Metrolina, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-4793060), filed by Candice Langston.(Gessner, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langston v. Second Harvest Food Bank of Metrolina, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candice Langston
Represented By: L. Michelle Gessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Second Harvest Food Bank of Metrolina, Inc.
Represented By: Wood Walter Lay
Represented By: Jacqueline Yount Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?