Houchins v. Gibson Group Consulting, LLC
Plaintiff: Kayla Houchins
Defendant: Gibson Group Consulting, LLC doing business as DecisionPathHR
Case Number: 3:2020cv00701
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 2 - 3 days. Discovery due by 8/15/2021. Motions due by 9/15/2021. Mediation deadline set for 8/29/2021. Jury Trial set for 11/1/2021 09:01 AM in Courtroom #5B, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney.. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/8/21. (clc)
February 1, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Jenkins, Amy)
January 28, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Gibson Group Consulting, LLC.(Jenkins, Amy)
January 27, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial with Jury Demand against Gibson Group Consulting, LLC, filed by Kayla Houchins.(Martoccio, Gary)
January 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Request for Protection From Court Appearances by Gibson Group Consulting, LLC (Jenkins, Amy)
January 22, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Gibson Group Consulting, LLC. Responses due by 2/5/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Jenkins, Amy)
January 22, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gibson Group Consulting, LLC (Jenkins, Amy)
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Gibson Group Consulting, LLC.(Jenkins, Amy)
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Yager Jenkins on behalf of Gibson Group Consulting, LLC (Jenkins, Amy)
January 22, 2021 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 2/10/2021. (clc)
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kayla Houchins. Gibson Group Consulting, LLC served on 1/4/2021, answer due 1/25/2021. (Martoccio, Gary)
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Gibson Group Consulting, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tlj)
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kayla Houchins (Martoccio, Gary)
December 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary James Martoccio on behalf of Kayla Houchins (Martoccio, Gary)
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Gibson Group Consulting, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-4809843), filed by Kayla Houchins. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Martoccio, Gary) Modified on 12/16/2020 to correct docket text (tlj).
December 16, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (tlj)
December 16, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houchins v. Gibson Group Consulting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibson Group Consulting, LLC doing business as DecisionPathHR
Represented By: Amy Yager Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Houchins
Represented By: Gary James Martoccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?