XPO Logistics, Inc. v. Bansal, et al
Plaintiff: XPO Logistics, Inc.
Defendant: Dhruv Bansal and Hub Group, Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv00046
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by XPO Logistics, Inc. (Wright, David)
February 24, 2021 NOTICE of Cancellation of Motion Hearing scheduled for 2/25/2021 pursuant to the Notice of Settlement (brl)
February 22, 2021 Filing 16 Parties Notice of Settlement. COURT NOTICE to the Parties: Agreement for entry of judgment or a stipulation of dismissal to be filed within 30 days or the court will dismiss the case without prejudice. Case Settlement Deadline 3/24/2021. (Cobb, John)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion to Seal. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/18/2021. (DLG)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Materials. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/18/2021. (DLG)
February 17, 2021 Filing 15 Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): re: #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion by XPO; (available to Dhruv Bansal, Hub Group, Inc, XPO Logistics, Inc.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 12, #7 Exhibit 13, #8 Exhibit 14)(Wright, David)
February 17, 2021 Filing 14 Appendix by XPO Logistics, Inc.. Appendix re: #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion [Preliminary Injunction] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts from Bansal dep tr_Redacted, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 12, #7 Exhibit 13, #8 Exhibit 14)(Wright, David)
February 17, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Seal by XPO Logistics, Inc.. Responses due by 3/3/2021 (Wright, David). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
February 17, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION for Leave to File [Supplement the Record on XPO's Motion for Preliminary Injunction] by XPO Logistics, Inc.. (Wright, David)
February 17, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File [Supplement the Record on XPO's Motion for Preliminary Injunction] by XPO Logistics, Inc.. Responses due by 3/3/2021 (Wright, David). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that Plaintiff's #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is set for a hearing. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2021 03:00 PM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Robert J. Conrad Jr. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by close of business on 2/22/2021. Plaintiffs shall reply by close of business on by 2/24/2021. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 2/17/2021. (brl)
February 11, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan R. White on behalf of XPO Logistics, Inc. (White, Ethan)
February 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas M. Jarrell on behalf of XPO Logistics, Inc. (Jarrell, Douglas)
February 11, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by XPO Logistics, Inc. (Wright, David)
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 Appendix by XPO Logistics, Inc.. Appendix re: #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Howell Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2021-01-20 Bansal - Full, #3 Exhibit Parker Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Hub Offer Letter, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Paul Smith, #6 Exhibit Record of Preliminary Injunctive Relief)(Wright, David)
February 11, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by XPO Logistics, Inc.. (Wright, David)
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by XPO Logistics, Inc.. Responses due by 2/25/2021 (Wright, David)
February 8, 2021 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 3/1/2021. (brl)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Dhruv Bansal.(Cobb, John)
January 29, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Cobb on behalf of Dhruv Bansal (Cobb, John)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 20-CVS-15016. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-4873179), filed by Dhruv Bansal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit A to Civil Cover Sheet)(Cobb, John) Modified filer and other court name on 1/29/2021 (js).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: XPO Logistics, Inc. v. Bansal, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XPO Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: David Calep Wright, III
Represented By: Douglas M. Jarrell
Represented By: Ethan R. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dhruv Bansal
Represented By: John H. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hub Group, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?