United States of America v. Approximately $9,920.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $9,920.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2021cv00078
Filed: February 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Max O Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 841
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Filing 4 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 03/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, J.)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Service (Direct Notice) by United States of America re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, J.)
February 22, 2021 Filing 2 WARRANT Issued for Arrest of Property signed by Clerk Frank G. Johns on 02/22/2021 (js)
February 21, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
February 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in rem against Approximately $9,920.00 in United States Currency, filed by United States of America.(Johnson, J.) Modified to correct wording on 2/22/2021 (js).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $9,920.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $9,920.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: J. Seth Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?