Massey v. USA et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Gene Massey
Defendant: DEA Agency, FNU Bridges, FNU Rawlings and USA
Case Number: 3:2021cv00123
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
2 Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 Filing 8 Mail (Order #7 ) addressed to Brandon Gene Massey returned as undeliverable. (brl)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Full Payment be made from Prison Account of Brandon Gene Massey and directing correctional facility to transmit payments. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
April 13, 2021 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlj)
April 8, 2021 Filing 5 Pro Se MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Brandon Gene Massey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlj)
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Brandon Gene Massey (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlj)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
March 26, 2021 Pro Se Law Clerk Referral to PSLC: 1 (tmg)
March 26, 2021 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. Magistrate Judge David Keesler no longer assigned to case. (tmg)
March 25, 2021 Deleted Entry. Filed in Error (tlj) Modified on 3/26/2021 (tmg).
March 25, 2021 Deleted Entry. Entered in Error. (tlj) Modified on 3/26/2021 (tmg).
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brandon Gene Massey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlj)
March 23, 2021 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brandon Gene Massey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massey v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEA Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Rawlings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Gene Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?