Travelers Casualty and Surety Company v. Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Surety Company and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Defendant: William Banholzer, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Kirk S Hachigian, Matthew Ross, Anthony Munk, Mark A Beck, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., Patrick Tolbert, Steven Wynne, Roderick Wendt, Gary S Michel, Gregory Maxwell, L Brooks Mallard, Martha Byorum, Gary S. Michel, Mark A. Beck, Kirk S. Hachigian and L. Brooks Mallard
3Rd Party Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00173
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2022 Filing 91 REPLY to Response to Motion re #65 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Claim for Declaratory Relief as to the Derivative Action and Records Demands by William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Kelly Beegle)(DeGeorge, R.)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #89 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #65 MOTION to Stay Reply due by 5/27/2022. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 5/10/2022. (ams)
May 9, 2022 Filing 89 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #65 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Claim for Declaratory Relief as to the Derivative Action and Records Demands by William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne. Responses due by 5/23/2022 (DeGeorge, R.) Modified to remove referral on 5/10/2022 (mga).
May 6, 2022 Filing 88 DECLARATION re #86 Response in Support of Motion, #87 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 36 - Docket as of 05/05/2022, #2 Exhibit Ex. 37 - Amended Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex. 38 - Notice of 11-03-2020 letter from Shieta Black, #4 Exhibit Ex. 39 - Notice of 12-18-2020 Letter from City of Miami, #5 Exhibit Ex. 40 - Notice of 03-03-2021 letter from John Ward, #6 Exhibit Ex. 41 - Notice of Derivative Action)(Mitchell, Michael)
May 6, 2022 Filing 87 RESPONSE in Opposition re #65 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Claim for Declaratory Relief as to the Derivative Action and Records Demands by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Replies due by 5/13/2022 (Mitchell, Michael)
May 6, 2022 Filing 86 RESPONSE in Support re #58 MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Mitchell, Michael)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #83 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Sean W. Carney as Counsel of Record for Defendants/Third Party Plainitiff. Attorney Sean W Carney's representation of Defendants/Third Party Plaintiff in this matter is hereby terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/12/22. (mga)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #82 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #65 MOTION to Stay, #58 MOTION for Summary Judgment-Cross-Motion. Responses due by 5/6/2022. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 4/11/2022. (ams)
April 11, 2022 Filing 83 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Sean W. Carney as Counsel of Record for Defendants/Third Party Plainitiff, MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ( Responses due by 4/25/2022 ) by William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (DeGeorge, R.). Motions referred to David Keesler.
April 11, 2022 Filing 82 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #65 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Claim for Declaratory Relief as to the Derivative Action and Records Demands, #58 MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Responses due by 4/25/2022 (Jo, Jang). Modified to remove referral on 4/11/2022 (mga).
March 29, 2022 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion re #33 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint by Old Republic Insurance Company. (Hartley, Michael)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #79 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #33 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint. Reply due by 3/29/2022. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/25/2022. (ams)
March 23, 2022 Filing 79 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #33 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint by Old Republic Insurance Company. Responses due by 4/6/2022 (Hartley, Michael). Modified to remove referral on 3/24/2022 (mga).
March 23, 2022 Filing 78 REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Against Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America] (Corrected) Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Against Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America by Defendants Mark A. Beck, L. Brooks Mallard, Kirk. S. Hachigian, Gary S. Michel, and Jeld-Wen Holdings,Inc. (Re ECF 68) by Mark A. Beck, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gary S. Michel. (DeGeorge, R.)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #76 Consent Motion for Leave to File Corrected Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendants Mark A. Beck, Brooks Mallard, Kirk S. Hachigian, Gary S. Michel, and Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc. Defendants Mark A Beck, L. Brooks Mallard, Kirk S. Hachigian, Gary S. Michel, and Jeld-Wen Holdings, Inc. may file a corrected Reply Brief in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment (Document No. 46), on or before March 25, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/23/22. (mga)
March 23, 2022 Filing 76 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Mark A. Beck, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gary S. Michel. Responses due by 4/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Corrected Reply Brief (clean), #2 Ex. B - Corrected Reply Brief (redline)) (DeGeorge, R.). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 23, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Correct Reply Brief in Support due by 3/25/2022. (mga)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #74 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion. Reply due by 4/22/2022. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/18/2022. (ams)
March 18, 2022 Filing 74 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #65 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Claim for Declaratory Relief as to the Derivative Action and Records Demands, #58 MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Responses due by 4/1/2022 (Jo, Jang). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #72 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #58 for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion , #65 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Claim for Declaratory Relief as to the Derivative Action and Records Demands. Responses due by 4/22/2022. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/17/2022. (ams) Modified text on 3/17/2022 (ams).
March 17, 2022 Filing 72 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #58 MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion, #65 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Claim for Declaratory Relief as to the Derivative Action and Records Demands by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Responses due by 3/31/2022 (Jo, Jang). Modified to remove referral on 3/17/2022 (mga). Modified to correct document relationship on 3/17/2022 (js). Modified text on 3/17/2022 (ams).
March 17, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #58 MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion. Replies due by 4/22/2022 (ams)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #70 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #33 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint. Reply due by 3/25/2022. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/16/2022. (ams)
March 15, 2022 Filing 70 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #33 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint by Old Republic Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/29/2022 (Hartley, Michael). Modified to remove referral on 3/15/2022 (mga).
March 14, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #58 MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion. Traveler's reply due by 4/11/2022 (ams)
March 11, 2022 Filing 69 DECLARATION of Kelly Beegle re #68 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Mark A. Beck, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gary S. Michel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carney, Sean)
March 11, 2022 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Against Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America] by Mark A. Beck, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gary S. Michel. (Carney, Sean)
March 11, 2022 Filing 67 DECLARATION of Kelly Beegle re #66 Response in Opposition to Motion,, [Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Travelers and Motion to Stay Plaintiff's Claim for Declaratory Relief as to Derivative Action and Records Demands] filed by William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne (DeGeorge, R.)
March 11, 2022 Filing 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion [and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Plaintiff's Claim for Declaratory Relief as to the Derivative Action and Records Demands] by William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne. Replies due by 3/18/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(DeGeorge, R.)
March 11, 2022 Filing 65 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Claim for Declaratory Relief as to the Derivative Action and Records Demands by William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne. Responses due by 3/25/2022 (DeGeorge, R.). Modified to remove referral on 3/14/2022 (mga).
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #62 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Against Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America]. Reply brief in support of Motion is due by 3/11/2022. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/4/2022. (ams)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #58 MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion. Jeld-Wen's brief in opposition is due by 3/11/2022. Traveler's reply will be due by 4/11/2022. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/4/2022. (ams)
March 3, 2022 Filing 62 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Against Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America] by Mark A. Beck, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gary S. Michel. Responses due by 3/17/2022 (DeGeorge, R.). Modified to remove referral on 3/4/2022 (mga).
March 3, 2022 Filing 61 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #58 MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion by William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne. Responses due by 3/17/2022 (DeGeorge, R.). Modified to remove referral on 3/4/2022 (mga).
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #58 MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion. Response due by 3/4/2022. In addition, the Court sets April 4, 2022 as the deadline for Travelers to file its Reply supporting its Cross Motion for Summary Judgment.Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 2/25/2022. (ams)
February 25, 2022 Filing 59 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time [to Extend Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment] by William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne. Responses due by 3/11/2022 (DeGeorge, R.) Modified to remove referral on 2/25/2022 (mga).
February 11, 2022 Filing 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Responses due by 2/25/2022 (Jo, Jang)
February 11, 2022 Filing 57 DECLARATION re #56 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Against Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America] filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 01, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 02, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 03, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 04, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 05, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 06, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 07, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 08, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 09, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit Exhibit 35)(Jo, Jang)
February 11, 2022 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Against Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America] in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Replies due by 2/18/2022 (Jo, Jang)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #33 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint . Defendant response due by 3/17/2022. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 1/25/2022. (ams)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Against Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America]. Plaintiff's response due by 2/11/2022. Defendant's reply brief shall be due by 3/4/2022. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 1/25/2022. (ams)
January 25, 2022 Filing 53 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Against Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America] by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Responses due by 2/8/2022 (Mitchell, Michael). Modified to remove referral on 1/25/2022 (mga).
January 24, 2022 Filing 52 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #33 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint by Old Republic Insurance Company. Responses due by 2/7/2022 (Hartley, Michael). Modified to remove referral on 1/24/2022 (mga).
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Against Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America] . Response due by 2/2/2022. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 12/29/2021. (ams)
December 22, 2021 Filing 50 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Against Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America] by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Responses due by 1/5/2022 (Mitchell, Michael). Modified to remove referral on 12/29/2021 (mga).
December 21, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #33 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint. Replies due by 1/31/2022 (ef)
December 20, 2021 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint [Old Republic] by Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc.. Replies due by 1/31/2022 (DeGeorge, R.) Modified text on 12/21/2021 (ef).
December 17, 2021 Filing 48 DECLARATION re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Against Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America] [in Support of Motion] filed by Mark A. Beck, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gary S. Michel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(DeGeorge, R.)
December 17, 2021 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM in Support re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Against Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America] by Mark A. Beck, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gary S. Michel. (DeGeorge, R.)
December 17, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Against Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America] by Mark A. Beck, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gary S. Michel. Responses due by 1/3/2022 (DeGeorge, R.)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Consent Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit for Briefs on Motion for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff. The parties may file briefs of up to thirty-five (35) pages in support of Defendants' motion for summary judgment and in response to Defendants' motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/10/21. (mga)
December 10, 2021 Filing 44 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages [for Briefs on Motion for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff] by Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc.. Responses due by 12/28/2021 (DeGeorge, R.). Motions referred to David Keesler.
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting Defendant's Jeld-Wen Holdings, Inc.'s #42 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #33 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint. Accordingly, the parties shall have an additional 21 days to file their briefs addressing the Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint in this matter. Responses due by 12/20/2021. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 11/29/2021. (brl)
November 24, 2021 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #33 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint by Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc.. Responses due by 12/8/2021 (Farnell, Michael). Modified on 11/24/2021 to remove referral (mek). Modified text to add the word unopposed on 11/29/2021 (js).
November 12, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Old Republic Insurance Company (Hartley, Michael)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #33 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint. Response due up to and through 11/29/2021. Old Republic may submit any reply brief up to and through 1/10/2022.Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 10/15/2021. (ams)
October 14, 2021 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time [Motion to Hold Third Party Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint in Abeyance or, in the Alternative, to Extend the Briefing Schedule] by Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc.. Responses due by 10/28/2021 (DeGeorge, R.) Modified to remove referral on 10/14/2021 (mga).
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Sean W. Carney for William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten,Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, and Steven Wynne (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/20/21. (mga)
September 21, 2021 Notice to Sean W. Carney: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 9/28/2021. (mga)
September 20, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sean W. Carney Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5226861. by William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne. (DeGeorge, R.). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #33 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint. Jeld-Wen Holdings Inc. response due by 10/14/2021. Old Republic Insurance Company reply due by 11/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/8/21. (mga)
September 8, 2021 Filing 35 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #33 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint by Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., Old Republic Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/22/2021 (DeGeorge, R.). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 31, 2021 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Support re #33 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint by Old Republic Insurance Company. (Brock, Walter)
August 31, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint by Old Republic Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/14/2021 (Brock, Walter)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Michael J. Hartley for Old Republic Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/20/2021. (kab)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Courtney A. Palko for Old Republic Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/20/2021. (kab)
August 20, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael J. Hartley Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-5175994. by Old Republic Insurance Company. (Brock, Walter). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 20, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Courtney A. Palko Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-5175986. by Old Republic Insurance Company. (Brock, Walter). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 20, 2021 Notice to Courtney A. Palko: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 8/27/2021. (kab)
August 20, 2021 Notice to Michael J. Hartley: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 8/27/2021. (kab)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Third-Party Defendant Old Republic Insurance Company's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #22 Third Party Complaint Summons Issued. Old Republic Insurance Company answer due 8/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/16/21. (mga)
August 16, 2021 Filing 27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #21 Third Party Complaint, by Old Republic Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brock, Walter). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 16, 2021 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Old Republic Insurance Company (Brock, Walter)
August 16, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter E. Brock, Jr on behalf of Old Republic Insurance Company (Brock, Walter)
August 5, 2021 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc.. Old Republic Insurance Company served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(DeGeorge, R.)
August 3, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #21 Counterclaims, by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.(Mitchell, Michael) Modified on 8/4/2021 (ams).
July 19, 2021 Filing 22 Third Party Complaint Summons Issued Electronically as to Old Republic Insurance Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(tlj) Modified text on 7/20/2021 (brl).
July 13, 2021 Filing 21 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT and Counterclaims against Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America with Jury Demand, filed by Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(DeGeorge, R.) Modified text on 7/15/2021 (ams).
July 13, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne.(DeGeorge, R.)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Michael E. Farnell for William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne(Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/8/2021. (mek)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Gabriel J. Le Chevallier for William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/8/2021. (mek)
July 8, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael E. Farnell Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-5108722. by William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne. (DeGeorge, R.). Motions referred to David Keesler.
July 8, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Gabriel J. Le Chevallier Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-5108706. by William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne. (DeGeorge, R.). Motions referred to David Keesler.
July 8, 2021 Notice to Gabriel J. Le Chevallier: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 7/15/2021. (mek)
July 8, 2021 Notice to Michael E. Farnell: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 7/15/2021. (mek)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jason C. Reichlyn for Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/25/21. (mga)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Thomas J. Judge for Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/25/21. (mga)
June 25, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jason C. Reichlyn Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-5092674. by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Mitchell, Michael). Motions referred to David Keesler.
June 25, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas J. Judge Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-5092560. by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Mitchell, Michael). Motions referred to David Keesler.
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. All Defendants shall have up to and including July 13, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/25/21. (mga)
June 25, 2021 Notice to Jason C. Reichlyn: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 7/2/2021. (mga)
June 25, 2021 Notice to Thomas J. Judge: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 7/2/2021. (mga)
June 24, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, [Extension of Deadline to Respond] by William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne. (DeGeorge, R.). Motions referred to David Keesler.
June 22, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc. (DeGeorge, R.)
June 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Charles DeCelle on behalf of All Defendants (DeCelle, Benjamin)
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Steven DeGeorge on behalf of All Defendants (DeGeorge, R.)
May 27, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. All Defendants. (Mitchell, Michael)
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)(tlj)
April 20, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jang H. Jo on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Jo, Jang) Modified text on 4/20/2021 (mga).
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Mitchell, Michael) Modified text on 4/20/2021 (mga).
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael William Mitchell on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Mitchell, Michael) Modified text on 4/20/2021 (mga).
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-4990989), filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Mitchell, Michael) Modified text on 4/20/2021 (mga). Modified text on 4/20/2021 (tlj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company v. Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Banholzer
Represented By: Benjamin Charles DeCelle
Represented By: Gabriel J. LeChevallier
Represented By: Michael E. Farnell
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Represented By: Sean W Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Stefany
Represented By: Benjamin Charles DeCelle
Represented By: Gabriel J. LeChevallier
Represented By: Michael E. Farnell
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Represented By: Sean W Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Taten
Represented By: Benjamin Charles DeCelle
Represented By: Gabriel J. LeChevallier
Represented By: Michael E. Farnell
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Represented By: Sean W Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk S Hachigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Ross
Represented By: Benjamin Charles DeCelle
Represented By: Gabriel J. LeChevallier
Represented By: Michael E. Farnell
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Represented By: Sean W Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Munk
Represented By: Benjamin Charles DeCelle
Represented By: Gabriel J. LeChevallier
Represented By: Michael E. Farnell
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Represented By: Sean W Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeld-Wen Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Charles DeCelle
Represented By: Gabriel J. LeChevallier
Represented By: Michael E. Farnell
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Represented By: Sean W Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Tolbert
Represented By: Benjamin Charles DeCelle
Represented By: Gabriel J. LeChevallier
Represented By: Michael E. Farnell
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Represented By: Sean W Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Wynne
Represented By: Benjamin Charles DeCelle
Represented By: Gabriel J. LeChevallier
Represented By: Michael E. Farnell
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Represented By: Sean W Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick Wendt
Represented By: Benjamin Charles DeCelle
Represented By: Gabriel J. LeChevallier
Represented By: Michael E. Farnell
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Represented By: Sean W Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary S Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Maxwell
Represented By: Benjamin Charles DeCelle
Represented By: Gabriel J. LeChevallier
Represented By: Michael E. Farnell
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Represented By: Sean W Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Brooks Mallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Byorum
Represented By: Benjamin Charles DeCelle
Represented By: Gabriel J. LeChevallier
Represented By: Michael E. Farnell
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Represented By: Sean W Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary S. Michel
Represented By: Benjamin Charles DeCelle
Represented By: Gabriel J. LeChevallier
Represented By: Michael E. Farnell
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Represented By: Sean W Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Beck
Represented By: Benjamin Charles DeCelle
Represented By: Gabriel J. LeChevallier
Represented By: Michael E. Farnell
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Represented By: Sean W Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk S. Hachigian
Represented By: Benjamin Charles DeCelle
Represented By: Gabriel J. LeChevallier
Represented By: Michael E. Farnell
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Represented By: Sean W Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Brooks Mallard
Represented By: Benjamin Charles DeCelle
Represented By: Gabriel J. LeChevallier
Represented By: Michael E. Farnell
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Represented By: Sean W Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Surety Company
Represented By: Michael William Mitchell
Represented By: Jang H. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Michael William Mitchell
Represented By: Jang H. Jo
Represented By: Jason Chirstopher Reichlyn
Represented By: Thomas James Judge, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Represented By: Courtney Ashe Palko
Represented By: Michael J. Hartley
Represented By: Walter E. Brock, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?