Curry v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Plaintiff: Jeriton Lavar Curry
Defendant: J. Olberding and Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 3:2021cv00190
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 Disregard docket entry. Clerk docketed in error. NEF regenerated. Modified on 6/17/2021 (hms).
June 3, 2021 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/4/2021) (js).
May 3, 2021 Acknowledged receipt of electronically transferred case by USDC District of South Carolina, their civil action no. 1:21-cv-01300. (rth)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Plaintiff's action is transferred to the District of South Carolina. The Clerk is instructed to terminate this action. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 04/30/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
April 30, 2021 Case electronically transferred to District of South Carolina on 04/30/2021. Original electronic file and docket sheet sent. (hms) Modified text on 4/30/2021. (khm)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS re #1 Complaint (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) re #1 Complaint by Jeriton Lavar Curry (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(eef)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Prisons, J. Olberding, filed by Jeriton Lavar Curry. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curry v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Olberding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeriton Lavar Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?