Bevans v. United States
Plaintiff: Billie Paul Bevans
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 3:2021cv00242
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. United States answer due 10/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/16/21. (mga)
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by United States. (Gatehouse, James). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
June 30, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Billie Paul Bevans., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Billie Paul Bevans re #1 Complaint, (Williams, Keith)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Connelly on behalf of Billie Paul Bevans (Connelly, Christopher)
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(js)
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): re: #1 Complaint, (available to Billie Paul Bevans, United States) (Williams, Keith)
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Alan Williams on behalf of Billie Paul Bevans (Williams, Keith)
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Billie Paul Bevans (Williams, Keith)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of submitting civil cover sheet by Billie Paul Bevans re #1 Complaint, (Williams, Keith)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-5041846), filed by Billie Paul Bevans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Denial Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - FBI Identity History Summary, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of B. Patton)(Williams, Keith)
May 21, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
May 21, 2021 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bevans v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: James B. Gatehouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie Paul Bevans
Represented By: Keith Alan Williams
Represented By: Christopher A. Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?