Cellco Partnership v. Village of Wesley Chapel et al
Plaintiff: Cellco Partnership and Cellco Partnership doing business as Verizon Wireless
Defendant: Village of Wesley Chapel Town Council, Village of Wesley Chapel and Village of Wesley Chapel, North Carolina
Case Number: 3:2021cv00273
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Village of Wesley Chapel Town Council answer due 8/16/2021; Village of Wesley Chapel, North Carolina answer due 8/16/2021. (brl)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cellco Partnership. Village of Wesley Chapel Town Council waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 6/16/2021; Village of Wesley Chapel, North Carolina waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (DeBoard, Camilla) Modified waiver sent & answer date on 7/19/2021 (brl).
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(tlj)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cellco Partnership (DeBoard, Camilla)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EQUITABLE RELIEF, DECLARATORY JUDGMENT, AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED REVIEW against Village of Wesley Chapel, North Carolina, Village of Wesley Chapel Town Council ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-5068126), filed by Cellco Partnership.(DeBoard, Camilla) Modified texton 6/11/2021 (rth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cellco Partnership v. Village of Wesley Chapel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cellco Partnership
Represented By: Camilla F DeBoard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cellco Partnership doing business as Verizon Wireless
Represented By: Camilla F DeBoard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Wesley Chapel Town Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Wesley Chapel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Wesley Chapel, North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?