Bradley v. Progress Residential Property Manager, LLC
Plaintiff: Kwamir Bradley
Defendant: Progress Residential Property Manager, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00277
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1640
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Nancy Stewart Litwak on behalf of Progress Residential Property Manager, LLC, Attorney Ryan Michel Arnold terminated. (Litwak, Nancy)
August 6, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Progress Residential Property Manager, LLC. (Litwak, Nancy)
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 Pro Se NOTICE of Change of Address by Kwamir Bradley (tlj)
July 30, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Kwamir Bradley. Replies due by 8/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(mga)
July 30, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Kwamir Bradley. Replies due by 8/6/2021 (mga)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ROSEBORO ORDER Setting Response Deadline re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 7/30/2021. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/12/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy Stewart Litwak on behalf of Progress Residential Property Manager, LLC (Litwak, Nancy)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Progress Residential Property Manager, LLC. (Arnold, Ryan)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Progress Residential Property Manager, LLC. Responses due by 7/23/2021 (Arnold, Ryan)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kwamir Bradley. Progress Residential Property Manager, LLC served on 6/18/2021, answer due 7/9/2021. (tlj)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Conventionally as to Progress Residential Property Manager, LLC. (dgr)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against Progress Residential Property Manager, LLC filed by Kwamir Bradley. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CHD065955. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(dgr)
June 10, 2021 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Case Assignment Packet. The document was served conventionally by US Mail (dgr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Progress Residential Property Manager, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progress Residential Property Manager, LLC
Represented By: Nancy Stewart Litwak
Represented By: Ryan Michel Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kwamir Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?