McAbee v. Marlow et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Allan McAbee
Defendant: FNU Marlow, Gaston County Sheriff's Department and Alan Cloniger
Case Number: 3:2021cv00282
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE to Plaintiff. You are hereby notified that NC Prisoner Legal Services may be available to assist you in conducting discovery. NCPLS Program Response due by 8/31/2021. (khm)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plaintiff's Complaint against Defendant Marlow for violation of Plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment rights based on the use of excessive force survives initial review. All claims against Defendants Alan Cloninger and the Gaston County Sheriff's Department and all Plaintiff's claims based on the violation of his due process rights under the Fourteenth Amendment are DISMISSED on initial review under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Clerk to mail blank summons to Plaintiff, who is to provide the necessary information for the US Marshal to effectuate service. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/9/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee and Directing Monthly Payments be Made from Prison Account of Christopher Allan McAbee. Directing correctional facility to transmit payments. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 8/3/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
July 19, 2021 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement as to Christopher Allan McAbee (Sealed - Court) submitted by Alan Cloninger, Sheriff of Gaston County. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js)
June 25, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) re #6 Amended Complaint by Christopher Allan McAbee (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(eef)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 Pro Se AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alan Cloniger, Gaston County Sheriff's Department, FNU Marlow, filed by Christopher Allan McAbee. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(eef)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint that is fully legible, signed, and dated within 30 days of this Order. If Plaintiff fails to timely submit an amended complaint in accordance with the terms of this Order, Plaintiff's Complaint may be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. (Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2021.) Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/15/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Frank G. Johns, Clerk of Court on 06/14/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(js)
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Christopher Allan McAbee (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Christopher Allan McAbee. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Summons, #3 Envelope)(js)
June 14, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger (js) Modified to correct extra wording on 8/9/2021 (js).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAbee v. Marlow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Allan McAbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaston County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Cloniger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?